Global Patent Index - EP 1101419 A1

EP 1101419 A1 2001-05-23 - Crash-helmet for motorcyclists

Title (en)

Crash-helmet for motorcyclists

Title (de)

Sturzhelm für Motorradfahrer

Title (fr)

Casque de protection pour motocyclistes

Publication

EP 1101419 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830711 A

Priority

EP 99830711 A

Abstract (en)

A crash-helmet (1) has a visor (3) and a mouth-gard (4), rotatably supported on a shell (2) so as to rotate about respective rotational pins (5, 10) which are suitably spaced, travelling along circular trajectories (8, 15) which intersect so as to superimpose a bottom edge (7) of the visor (3) and a top edge (13) of said mouth-gard (4) in a position where both are simultaneously lowered; the visor (3) is provided with first engagement means (6; 36) and the mouth-gard (4) is provided with second engagement means (11; 111), the first and the second engagement means (6; 36, 11; 111) being designed to co-operate, over a predetermined circumference arc of the circular trajectories (8, 15), so that the mouth-gard (4) causes partial raising of the visor (3) when the mouth-gard (4) is lowered. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/326 (2013.01); A42B 3/222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101419 A1 20010523; EP 1101419 B1 20040211; DE 69914768 D1 20040318; DE 69914768 T2 20041209; ES 2215371 T3 20041001

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101117

2013-10-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131029

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101116

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081116

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081116

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2005-01-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LUMA ITALIA S.R.L.

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215371 T3

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914768 P 20040318

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI