Global Patent Index - EP 1101422 A2

EP 1101422 A2 2001-05-23 - Postman's bag or similar

Title (en)

Postman's bag or similar

Title (de)

Tasche für Briefträger oder ähnlichem

Title (fr)

Sac de facteur ou similaire

Publication

EP 1101422 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830685 A

Priority

IT TO991011 A

Abstract (en)

Bag for postmen or similar use, comprising a containing space (9) which top is open, with a front face (5), a rear face (6) a bottom face (8) and two side faces (7), and a closing flap (11), which is an upper extension of the rear face (6), overlapping said front face (5) at least partially. The bag comprises a strap (22) to be carried on the shoulder and a lumbar strap (4), attached to said rear face (6) including a cushion (30) destined to be placed between the rear face (6) of the bag and the body of the user. Moreover, an elastic stiffener (25) is attached to said rear face (6) which is horizontally elongated, arranged with its surface essentially parallel to said rear face (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 3/02; A45F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101422 A2 20010523; EP 1101422 A3 20011031; IT 1306896 B1 20011011; IT TO991011 A1 20010521; IT TO991011 D0 19991119

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030617

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-07-31 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020420;LT PAYMENT 20020420;LV PAYMENT 20020420;MK PAYMENT 20020420;RO PAYMENT 20020420;SI PAYMENT 20020420

2002-07-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: POSTE ITALIANE S.P.A.

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 45F 3/02 A, 7A 45F 3/00 B, 7A 45F 3/14 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI