Global Patent Index - EP 1101423 A3

EP 1101423 A3 2001-05-30 - Furniture

Title (en)

Furniture

Title (de)

Möbel

Title (fr)

Meuble

Publication

EP 1101423 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00310207 A

Priority

GB 9927251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1101423A2] A furniture support system and method of varying the configuration of a furniture support system is provided in a variety of configurations which render changes in configuration of furniture, such as desks, easier and allows greater versatility in the furniture systems which can be provided as a result. In a particularly form, a furniture support system is provided which comprises two or more upright members, at least one of the upright members being provided with a releasable engagement between the upright member and a laterally extended member, wherein a portion of the upright member or laterally extended member is received within the other. In this way, the number of laterally extending members can be varied to suit a variety of different work surfaces which need supporting, without needing to remove uprights from the system, or without having to leave in situ redundant laterally extending members. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 1/04 (2006.01); A47B 13/02 (2006.01); A47B 13/06 (2006.01); A47B 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/06 (2013.01); A47B 1/04 (2013.01); A47B 13/02 (2013.01); A47B 17/065 (2013.01); A47B 2037/005 (2013.01); A47B 2200/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101423 A2 20010523; EP 1101423 A3 20010530; GB 0027984 D0 20010103; GB 2356341 A 20010523; GB 2356341 B 20040421; GB 9927251 D0 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070530

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030924

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI