Global Patent Index - EP 1101425 A1

EP 1101425 A1 2001-05-23 - Adjustable assembly system on sectional elements

Title (en)

Adjustable assembly system on sectional elements

Title (de)

Verstellbares Aufbausystem auf Profilelementen

Title (fr)

Système de fixation ajustable sur des profilés

Publication

EP 1101425 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00203931 A

Priority

BE 9900750 A

Abstract (en)

The fixing system consists of a U-section rail (2), or two opposite L-section rails, with holes (3) to receive the grooved ends of a bar (4). The bar is held in place by gravity and is fixed by a removable wedging element which has a clamp (8) for gripping the edge of a supported component. The rail holes and bars can be of variable cross-section, e.g. round, square or triangular, and the wedging element can be shaped to support different components.

Abstract (fr)

Système de fixation axialement ajustable sur des profilés, comprenant au moins un profilé (2) présentant des perforations (3) en vis-à-vis, au moins une barrette (4) amovible apte à être insérée dans les perforations (3), un moyen de calage de barrette (4), au moins une patte (5) comportant une élément de support et un élément de retenue apte à être inséré entre le profilé (2) et la barrette (4) introduite dans une paire de perforations en vis-à-vis. Le système de fixation utilisable notamment pour des crémaillères, des étagères, des penderies, des rayonnages, des échafaudages, des échelles, etc., peut être aisément monté, démonté ou modifié sans outil. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/38; A47B 57/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/38 (2006.01); A47B 57/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/487 (2013.01); A47B 57/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101425 A1 20010523; BE 1013142 A5 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040731

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI