Global Patent Index - EP 1101426 A1

EP 1101426 A1 2001-05-23 - Chair

Title (en)

Chair

Title (de)

Stuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise

Publication

EP 1101426 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203832 A

Priority

SE 9904126 A

Abstract (en)

A chair (1) comprises a leg frame, a back support (3) and a seat (5). The leg frame consists of two separate halves. A part of each one of these halves extends in beneath the seat (5) from each side of it and is secured in a body portion of the seat (5) by means of snap- or insert connections. The parts which extend in beneath the seat (5) are advantageously accommodated in undercut recesses (17, 18, 19) which are disposed on the underside of the seat (5). Further, these parts have at least one manifest curve (13, 14) each and they lie substantially in one and the same plane. The back support (3) has downwardly open accommodation spaces (30) for accommodating two uprights (8) which extend upwards from each respective half of the leg frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 4/02; A47C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 5/04 (2006.01); A47C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 5/04 (2013.01); A47C 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101426 A1 20010523; SE 9904126 D0 19991116; SE 9904126 L 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031115

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030704

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI