Global Patent Index - EP 1101430 A1

EP 1101430 A1 2001-05-23 - Beverage filter cartridge system

Title (en)

Beverage filter cartridge system

Title (de)

Kartuschenfiltriersystem

Title (fr)

Système de filtration à cartouches

Publication

EP 1101430 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00310131 A

Priority

  • US 16566399 P
  • US 20166000 P

Abstract (en)

A disposable stepped beverage filter cartridge system for brewing different types of single serving beverages. The stepped beverage filter cartridge system comprises a sealed stepped container (12), a filter element (16) internally subdividing the container to form a brewing chamber, a beverage powder (20) contained in the brewing chamber, liquid inlet means piercing the container to provide hot pressurized water to the brewing chamber and a liquid outlet means to allow for extracted beverage product to be removed and collected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47J 31/06; B65D 81/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47J 31/06 (2006.01); B65D 81/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/804 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/8043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101430 A1 20010523; CA 2325978 A1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI