Global Patent Index - EP 1101538 A3

EP 1101538 A3 2004-12-15 - Electrically driven dispensing apparatus for cartridges

Title (en)

Electrically driven dispensing apparatus for cartridges

Title (de)

Elektrisch betriebenes Kartuschenaustraggeraet

Title (fr)

Appareil d'extrusion électrique pour cartouches

Publication

EP 1101538 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00810989 A

Priority

CH 208199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1101538A2] To drive advance and retraction (pressure release) strokes with greater loading, a drive motor (M1) is coupled via a first gear train (40, 41) and a first dog clutch (43) to the main drive shaft (27). For lower loading and more rapid advance, the drive is coupled via a second gear train (55, 56) and drive shaft (54) through a second dog clutch (50) to the main shaft. The drive is coupled through either clutch, as required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 9/24 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B05C 17/01 (2006.01); F16D 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/0103 (2013.01); B05C 17/00553 (2013.01); B05C 17/0133 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101538 A2 20010523; EP 1101538 A3 20041215; JP 2001187950 A 20010710; US 6371336 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-10-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLER, WILHELM A.

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIXPAC SYSTEMS AG

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIXPAC SYSTEMS AG

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI