Global Patent Index - EP 1101545 A2

EP 1101545 A2 2001-05-23 - Wire drawing machine

Title (en)

Wire drawing machine

Title (de)

Drahtziehmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine a tréfiler

Publication

EP 1101545 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00124359 A

Priority

IT PD990255 A

Abstract (en)

A wire drawing machine (10) of the multiple-pass type, comprising successions of dies (28) and means (11a,11b) for subjecting to traction and guiding the wire being drawn, the traction and guiding means comprising a plurality of capstans (16) which are rigidly coupled to corresponding coaxial hollow shafts (15) being provided with kinematically independent rotary motions, the shafts being arranged one inside the other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/02 (2006.01); B21C 1/08 (2006.01); B21C 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/02 (2013.01); B21C 1/08 (2013.01); B21C 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101545 A2 20010523; EP 1101545 A3 20020605; IT 1309934 B1 20020205; IT PD990255 A1 20010518

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021106

2003-04-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21C 1/02 A, 7B 21C 1/12 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI