Global Patent Index - EP 1101584 A2

EP 1101584 A2 2001-05-23 - Method for manufacturing tiles having their exposed side provided with depressions and reliefs to reproduce the appearance of split quarrystone

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing tiles having their exposed side provided with depressions and reliefs to reproduce the appearance of split quarrystone

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fliesen mit Vertiefungen und Reliefs auf der freiliegenden Seite um das Erscheinungsbild von Bruchstein nach zu bilden

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de carreaux avec face visible pourvue de dépressions et de reliefs pour simuler l'apparence de pierre de carrière fondue

Publication

EP 1101584 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203852 A

Priority

IT RE990116 A

Abstract (en)

The method comprises the following operations: in a usual mould, forming a crude tile from an atomized powder mix, that mould punch intended to create the exposed face of the tile reproducing the appearance of split quarrystone or of a non-flat surface; drying the thus formed tile in a continuous dryer in accordance with a usual drying cycle; applying on the exposed side of the dried tile at least one layer of coloured atomized clay or of pigment in powder form, to at least partly cover said side of the tile; subjecting the exposed side of the tile to the action of an air stream at an incidence angle tending towards zero; kiln-firing the tile treated in this manner in accordance with a usual firing cycle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/02; B28B 7/00; B28B 11/00; B28B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/00 (2006.01); B28B 7/00 (2006.01); B28B 7/34 (2006.01); B28B 11/04 (2006.01); B28B 11/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/0872 (2013.01); B28B 3/003 (2013.01); B28B 7/0064 (2013.01); B28B 7/342 (2013.01); B28B 11/044 (2013.01); B28B 11/08 (2013.01); E04F 13/147 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101584 A2 20010523; EP 1101584 A3 20030326; IT 1311048 B1 20020228; IT RE990116 A1 20010515; IT RE990116 D0 19991115

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030927

2004-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI