Global Patent Index - EP 1101585 A2

EP 1101585 A2 2001-05-23 - Method for manufacturing tiles having the appearance of old rustic tiles of craftsman production

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing tiles having the appearance of old rustic tiles of craftsman production

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fliesen mit dem Erscheinungsbild alter, rustikaler, handwerklich hergestellter Fliesen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de carreaux avec apparence de carreaux vieux et rustique produit par un artisan

Publication

EP 1101585 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203851 A

Priority

IT RE990117 A

Abstract (en)

A method for manufacturing tiles having the appearance of old rustic tiles of craftsman production, comprising the following operations: in a usual mould, forming a crude tile from an atomized powder mix comprising inclusions of material which volatilizes at a temperature less than or equal to 600 DEG C, drying the thus formed tile in a continuous dryer using a usual drying cycle, kiln-firing the tile treated in this manner using a usual firing cycle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/34; B28B 11/00; B28B 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/00 (2013.01); B28B 11/0872 (2013.01); B28B 11/243 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101585 A2 20010523; EP 1101585 A3 20030102; IT 1310979 B1 20020227; IT RE990117 A1 20010515; IT RE990117 D0 19991115

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28B 11/24 A, 7B 28B 11/00 B, 7C 04B 38/06 B, 7C 04B 38/00 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI