Global Patent Index - EP 1101598 A1

EP 1101598 A1 2001-05-23 - Device for pressing a material in granular or powder form, and method that use the device

Title (en)

Device for pressing a material in granular or powder form, and method that use the device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Pressen eines Materials in Granulat- oder Pulverform und Verfahren zur Anwendung dieser Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le pressage d'un matériau sous forme de granules ou de poudre et procédé utilisant l'appareil

Publication

EP 1101598 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00123943 A

Priority

IT MI992427 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a method for the dry pressing of a material in granular or powder form, to a device suitable to be used to perform pressing. The device includes: a bed plate (14); a movable body (10)for supporting a mold; a plurality of vertical rods (15)which engage the movable body from below; a supporting member (17)for supporting the rods; and a movement member (19,20) for vertically moving the supporting member. The method includes feeding liquid at low pressure to cylinder and piston assemblies (28, 29)which support the rods, closing a flow control means in order to prevent the escape of the liquid, and actuating a movement member in order to lift the movable body (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/04; B28B 3/08; B30B 15/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/04 (2006.01); B30B 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/04 (2013.01); B30B 15/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101598 A1 20010523; BR 0005447 A 20010703; IT 1314073 B1 20021204; IT MI992427 A1 20010521; IT MI992427 D0 19991119

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-17 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020520

2002-03-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI