Global Patent Index - EP 1101618 A1

EP 1101618 A1 2001-05-23 - Method and system for supplying hot melt ink to a printer

Title (en)

Method and system for supplying hot melt ink to a printer

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Versorgung eines Druckers mit heissschmelzbarer Tinte

Title (fr)

Procédé et système pour l'alimentation d'encre thermofusible à une imprimante

Publication

EP 1101618 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00204035 A

Priority

  • EP 00204035 A
  • EP 99203944 A
  • EP 00200361 A

Abstract (en)

A method for supplying pellets (22, 24, 26) of hot melt ink to a printer comprising an ink reservoir (10) having an inlet port (20) through which the ink pellets can be supplied, and a closure member for sealingly closing the inlet port, characterized in that one (22) of the ink pellets is fitted in the inlet port (20) so as to serve as said closure member and, when the pellet (22) is to be supplied to the ink reservoir (10) it is pressed through the inlet port, and a new pellet (24) is fitted therein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17593 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101618 A1 20010523; EP 1101618 B1 20051102

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180731

2018-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171116

2018-07-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60023631

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023631 P 20051208

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI