Global Patent Index - EP 1101640 A2

EP 1101640 A2 2001-05-23 - Automotive air conditioning unit

Title (en)

Automotive air conditioning unit

Title (de)

Fahrzeugklimaanlage

Title (fr)

Appareil de climatisation pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1101640 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00125521 A

Priority

  • JP 33313099 A
  • JP 33205699 A
  • JP 33203999 A
  • JP 2000312083 A

Abstract (en)

A casing (11) has air inlet and outlet openings which are connected through an air flow passage defined in the casing. The casing has a bottom surface in the vicinity of the air inlet opening. An evaporator (13) is arranged in the air flow passage. A heater (15) is arranged in the air flow passage at a position downstream of the evaporator (13). An air flow control door is arranged in the air flow passage for controlling a ratio between an air amount flowing in a heater-bypassing passage which extends from the evaporator to the air outlet opening bypassing the heater and an air amount flowing in a heater-passing passage which extends from the evaporator to the air outlet opening through the heater. A water guide groove is provided at the bottom surface of the casing at a position opposite to the position where the air inlet opening is provided. A drain pipe (23) is held by the casing and connected to the water guide groove. A plurality of water backflow obstruction projections are formed on the bottom surface in an area defined between the water guide groove and the air inlet opening. Each projection is shaped and oriented so as to obstruct a flow of water in a direction from the water guide groove toward the air inlet opening. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60H 1/32; B60H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00 (2006.01); B60H 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00514 (2013.01); B60H 1/3233 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101640 A2 20010523; EP 1101640 A3 20031119; EP 1101640 B1 20060426; DE 60027522 D1 20060601; DE 60027522 T2 20060907; US 6478083 B1 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061121

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061121

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027522 P 20060601

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040212

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60H 1/32 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60H 1/00 B

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001121

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI