Global Patent Index - EP 1101674 A2

EP 1101674 A2 2001-05-23 - Mobile washing apparatus

Title (en)

Mobile washing apparatus

Title (de)

Mobile Waschbox

Title (fr)

Dispositif de lavage mobile

Publication

EP 1101674 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119071 A

Priority

DE 19954961 A

Abstract (en)

The mobile washing box (18) consists of a steel framework (7-13) composed of steel bearers with walls (e.g. 14) attached, and has entry and exit apertures for the vehicles.. The box has a cover (5) on the steel framework, pivoted by a turning axis so that it can be turned from a vertical transporting position to a horizontal use position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine mobile Waschbox zur Aufnahme mindestens eines Fahrzeugs zu Reinigungszwecken, bestehend aus einem Stahlgerüst aus Stahlträgern mit Wandungen, wobei auf zwei sich gegenüberliegenden Seiten des Stahlgerüstes Öffnungen zum Ein- und Ausfahren der Fahrzeuge vorgesehen sind, und die Waschbox nach oben hin abschließende Decke an dem Stahlgerüst derart um mindestens eine Schwenkachse schwenkbar befestigt ist, daß diese Decke aus einer etwa vertikalen Transportposition in eine etwa horizontale Benutzungsposition bringbar ist. Hierbei sind bevorzugt bereits sämtliche Reinigungseinrichtungen wie Programmautomat, Lanzenköcher, Schaumbürstenwanne, Deckenkreisel, Hochdruckleitungen, Leuchtkörper, Spritzeinrichtung und Schaumbürste und eventuell auch die restliche Waschtechnik wie Wasserspeicher, Wasseraufbereitung, Heizung und Druckerzeugungseinheit vorinstalliert in Transportposition vorhanden. Vorteil dieser erfindungsgemäßen, mobilen Waschbox ist, daß nahezu die gesamte Waschbox witterungsunabhängig in der Montagehalle vormontiert werden kann und bereits ein Funktionstest durchgeführt werden kann, danach die funktionstüchtigen, mobilen Waschboxen in Transportposition platzsparend auf einen herkömmlichen LKW verladen werden, an Ort und Stelle gefahren werden und dort auf einen vorbereiteten Fundamentboden gestellt werden, wobei dann lediglich noch das Dach in Benutzungsposition hochgeklappt werden muß. Bisher wurden die Waschboxen auf der Baustelle montiert, was zu erheblichen Kosten im Hinblick auf erhöhte Montage und Testzeiten führte. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60S 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60S 3/00 (2006.01); B60S 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60S 3/063 (2013.01); B60S 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK GR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101674 A2 20010523; EP 1101674 A3 20031001; EP 1101674 B1 20080423; DE 19954961 A1 20010613; DE 19954961 C2 20030220; DE 50015121 D1 20080605

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080724

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-04-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090126

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080423

2008-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015121

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GR LI NL

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GR LI NL

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040323

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI