Global Patent Index - EP 1101675 A3

EP 1101675 A3 2002-09-11 - Process and device for adjusting the braking effect in a vehicle

Title (en)

Process and device for adjusting the braking effect in a vehicle

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Einstellung der Bremswirkung bei einem Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'ajustement de l'effet de freinage dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 1101675 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00117765 A

Priority

DE 19955243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1101675A2] Sensors monitor for a predetermined situation ( mu split) related to wheel speeds. When this is detected, control (Aij) of braking units (13a-d) takes place. Reduced braking effect is applied to the wheel on the rear axis where grip is reduced, as a function of the braking effect on the same side of the front axis. Alternatively no braking is applied to this wheel An Independent claim is included for corresponding equipment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/172 (2006.01); B60T 8/1764 (2006.01); B60T 8/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/1764 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101675 A2 20010523; EP 1101675 A3 20020911; EP 1101675 B1 20100707; DE 19955243 A1 20010523; DE 50015954 D1 20100819; JP 2001163210 A 20010619; JP 4954364 B2 20120613; US 6375280 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130820

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-07-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50015954

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101018

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110408

2010-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015954 P 20100819

2010-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2010-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60T 8/1764 20060101AFI20100317BHEP

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POGGENBURG, RUEDIGER

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIEHLE, STEFAN

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SONNTAG, EBERHARD

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070503

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI