Global Patent Index - EP 1101695 A2

EP 1101695 A2 2001-05-23 - Life raft

Title (en)

Life raft

Title (de)

Rettungsinsel

Title (fr)

Radeau de sauvetage

Publication

EP 1101695 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00811021 A

Priority

  • CH 207599 A
  • CH 13832000 A

Abstract (en)

The inflatable raft or boat has a bearing base body formed from at least two banana shaped buoyant bodies, so that the base body has an easily maneuverable boat or canoe shape. The buoyant bodies consist of two wall elements (14, 15) of waterproofed fabric, joined to each other by an airtight weld along a peripheral seam (11).

Abstract (de)

Es werden eine aufblasbare Rettungsinsel und ein Schlauchboot vorgeschlagen, deren tragende Grundkörper (10) von mindestens zwei bananenförmigen Schwimmkörpern gebildet werden, so dass der tragende Grundkörper eine im Wasser gut manövrierfähige Boots- oder Kanuform aufweist. Die Schwimmkörper sind aus zwei Wandelementen (14,15) aus PU-beschichtetem Gewebe gefertigt, die entlang einer peripheren Naht (11) luftdicht miteinander verschweisst sind, wobei die Naht (11) eine Ebene definiert. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/04; B63B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 7/08 (2006.01); B63C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 7/082 (2013.01); B63C 9/04 (2013.01); B63B 2231/48 (2013.01); B63C 2009/042 (2013.01); B63C 2009/044 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101695 A2 20010523; EP 1101695 A3 20030813

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEIER, JUERG

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GYGAX AG

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EUGSTER, URS

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEIER, JUERG

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI