Global Patent Index - EP 1101696 A2

EP 1101696 A2 2001-05-23 - Outboard motor with supporting structure

Title (en)

Outboard motor with supporting structure

Title (de)

Aussenbordmotor mit Stützkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Moteur hors bord avec structure de support

Publication

EP 1101696 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00125123 A

Priority

JP 33063499 A

Abstract (en)

An outboard motor (5) comprises an outboard motor supporting structure having at least two spaced supporting projection portions (42) adapted to support the outboard motor (5) in a stable position when being removed from a hull (3), brought to the "stowing attitude" and placed on a placing surface (36). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 20/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 20/00 (2006.01); B63H 20/36 (2006.01); F02B 61/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 20/36 (2013.01); F02B 61/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FI FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101696 A2 20010523; EP 1101696 A3 20030423; EP 1101696 B1 20050810; JP 2001146194 A 20010529; JP 4297398 B2 20090715

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *YAMAHA MARINE K.K.

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-08-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-08-04 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100720

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FI FR GB IT NL

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TSUJII, EIICHIROC/O SANSHIN KOGYO K.K.

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAMAHA MARINE KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-02-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE FI FR GB IT NL

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63H 20/32 A

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63H 20/36 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI