Global Patent Index - EP 1101702 A2

EP 1101702 A2 2001-05-23 - APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING ELONGATED ARTICLES

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING ELONGATED ARTICLES

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von langgestreckten Packgütern

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR EMBALLER DES ARTICLES OBLONGS

Publication

EP 1101702 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125107 A

Priority

DE 19955469 A

Abstract (en)

The packing device has an indexing unit (28) with compartments to receive and hold the articles. It has walls for the packing container. There is a loading unit (44) to guide the articles and to forward the indexing unit. there is also a device (16, 21) to draw back the indexing unit from the packing container so that the articles remain in the arranged order.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von langgestreckten Packgütern (32), insbesondere einer Mehrzahl von in einer Säulenform gestapelten Behältnissen, in einen im Packzustand eine Mehrzahl voneinander benachbart angeordneten, in Erstreckungsrichtung achsparallelen Packgütern aufweisenden Verpackungsbehälter, mit einer Registereinheit (28), die eine zum Aufnehmen und Halten der Mehrzahl von Packgütern (32) ausgebildete Unterteilung (30) aufweist und zum Einsetzen in den Verpackungsbehälter und/oder zum zumindest teilweisen Umkleiden mit Wänden des Verpackungsbehälters ausgebildet ist, einer Ladeeinheit (44,46), die zum Zuführen der Packgüter und zum gleichzeitigen Beschicken der Registereinheit mit einer Mehrzahl von Packgütern ausgebildet ist, und Mitteln zum Abziehen (16,21) einer bevorzugt vollständig beschickten Registereinheit (28) aus dem Verpackungsbehälter so, dass die Mehrzahl von Packgütern nach dem Abziehen der Registereinheit in einer der Unterteilung entsprechenden Anordnung im Verpackungsbehälter verbleiben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101702 A2 20010523; EP 1101702 A3 20030716; DE 19955469 A1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040117

2004-05-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI