Global patent index - EP 1101708 A1

EP 1101708 A1 2001-05-23 - Food wrapping material for home use

Title (en)

Food wrapping material for home use

Title (de)

Für den Hausgebrauch bestimmte Verpackungsfolie für Nahrungsmittel

Title (fr)

Feuille d'emballage pour produits alimentaires destiné à l'usage domestique

Publication

EP 1101708 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203864 A

Priority

IT TO990202 U

Abstract (en)

A ribbon, which is wound in a roll, comprises two superimposed polyethylene sheets (10, 12) that are bonded together along their longitudinal edges (16, 18). Each of the sheets comprises two or three co-extruded layers (10a, 10,b, 10c, 12a, 12b, 12c), of which the external layers (10a, 12a) are made tacky by means of an additive to the polyethylene. In use, a piece of ribbon is cut, the object to be wrapped is inserted between the sheets, and the margins are folded over each other and they adhere to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 65/10; B65D 75/26; B65D 75/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/10 (2006.01); B65D 75/26 (2006.01); B65D 75/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/26 (2013.01); B65D 65/10 (2013.01); B65D 75/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101708 A1 20010523; IT TO990202 U1 20010516; IT TO990202 V0 19991116

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040220

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI