Global Patent Index - EP 1101709 A1

EP 1101709 A1 2001-05-23 - Packaging provided with a handle

Title (en)

Packaging provided with a handle

Title (de)

Verpackung mit Handgriff

Title (fr)

Emballage muni d'une poignee

Publication

EP 1101709 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403205 A

Priority

FR 9914459 A

Abstract (en)

The folded cardboard beverage bottle package has a blank with a main panel (1) with side flaps (2,3) at least one of which has an extension forming the floor of the package. The main panel of the blank has a handle formed by a reinforcing strips (35) extending on the main surface. The reinforcement strip is glued between two cardboard strips (31,37). The main panel and the opposed side surfaces are folded to form a quadruple thickness with the strips to reinforce the package.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un emballage muni d'une poignée formé par pliage d'un flan en carton présentant une surface principale (1) prolongée de part et d'autre par des surfaces latérales adjacentes (2, 3) pour former des faces latérales, l'une au moins de ces surfaces adjacentes (2, 3) étant prolongée par une surface de fond (4) pour former le fond de l'emballage, caractérisé en ce que la surface principale (1) du flan présente une poignée formée par une bande de renfort (35) s'étendant sur la surface principale (1) et la partie supérieure au moins de deux faces latérales opposées, la bande de renfort étant collée entre deux bandes de cartons (31, 37), la surface principale (1) et la partie supérieure desdites deux faces latérales opposées étant pliée pour former dans la zone de pliage une quadruple épaisseur formée par les deux bandes (31, 37) enserrant la bande de renfort (35) et une quatrième bande (30,30') superposée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/462 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/36 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00141 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00462 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00524 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0053 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00728 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101709 A1 20010523; FR 2801037 A1 20010518; FR 2801037 B1 20020104

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040615

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI