Global Patent Index - EP 1101711 A1

EP 1101711 A1 2001-05-23 - Vessel for food products, in particular for ice cream and the like

Title (en)

Vessel for food products, in particular for ice cream and the like

Title (de)

Behälter für Lebensmittel, insbesondere für Speiseeis und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Conteneur pour des alimentaires, spécialement pour crème de glace et similaire

Publication

EP 1101711 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00120443 A

Priority

IT MI990693 U

Abstract (en)

A vessel (1) for food products, specifically designed for ice cream and the like, comprises a vessel body (2) made of a thermally insulating material and having at least a top opening and adapted to hold therein a plurality of cups (5) which can be abutted against the edge (3) of the opening so that the cups (5) do not contact the inner wall (9) of the vessel body (2), the cups (5) and vessel body (2) being provided with respective covers (10,11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3827 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101711 A1 20010523; IT 247138 Y1 20020502; IT MI990693 U1 20010516; IT MI990693 V0 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030121

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI