Global Patent Index - EP 1101724 A2

EP 1101724 A2 2001-05-23 - Balustrades for an escalator

Title (en)

Balustrades for an escalator

Title (de)

Geländer für Fahrtreppe

Title (fr)

Balustrades pour escalier roulant

Publication

EP 1101724 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00124229 A

Priority

JP 32569199 A

Abstract (en)

In order to provide an escalator having an extended space (100) between the balustrades (7) is provided, balustrades are arranged outside the machine room (1), and a handrail support portion (8) is provided on the side surface of the upper end portion of the balustrade which is arranged so as to, for example, tilt or curve toward the step side from the upper portion of the machine room or so as to vertically stand, and an upper-line track of the handrail is arranged in the top end portion of the support portion. Further, in a mechanism for guiding and moving an endlessly connected handrail (9), the handrail transport roller (13) is arranged in the outer side and the driving unit of the transfer roller is arranged in the step side. By doing so, by making use of a space produced in the machine room, the step tread portion and the riser portion of the step can be extended in the width direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/04 (2006.01); B66B 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/22 (2013.01); B66B 23/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101724 A2 20010523; EP 1101724 A3 20021030; EP 1101724 B1 20050316; CN 1174911 C 20041110; CN 1295968 A 20010523; DE 60018680 D1 20050421; DE 60018680 T2 20060323; HK 1036264 A1 20050408; JP 2001139273 A 20010522; SG 91307 A1 20020917; TW M245202 U 20041001

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018680 P 20050421

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2005-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI, LTD.

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI