Global Patent Index - EP 1101726 A1

EP 1101726 A1 2001-05-23 - Lifting and load handling device for an aluminium production installation

Title (en)

Lifting and load handling device for an aluminium production installation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Heben und Handhaben von Lasten für eine Aluminium-Herstellungsanlage

Title (fr)

Unité de levage et de manutention de charges au sein d'une installation de production d'aluminium

Publication

EP 1101726 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420224 A

Priority

FR 9914580 A

Abstract (en)

A unit for the lifting and handling of charges (7) at the heart of an installation for the production of aluminium by igneous electrolysis is claimed, the installation comprising at least one series of electrolysis cells in series and being provided with a rail track destined to allow the displacement of at least one overhead crane over the series of cells for the realisation of the different functions necessary for operating the installation. The lifting and handling unit makes up one of the overhead cranes, on which are at least two lifting and handling assemblies, each mounted on a chariot (11, 12, 13), able to be displaced in a direction perpendicular to the translation of the station (7). This lifting and handling unit (7) is characterised in that the chariots are able to move on the unit one above the other in order to allow them to cross each other.

Abstract (fr)

Cette unité de levage et de manutention de charges (7) au sein d'une installation de production d'aluminium par électrolyse ignée, comprenant au moins une série de cuves d'électrolyse (I) en série et étant pourvue d'un chemin de roulement (5) destiné à permettre le déplacement d'au moins un pont roulant au dessus de ladite série de cuves pour la réalisation des différentes fonctions nécessaire à la mise en oeuvre de ladite installation, constitue l'un desdits ponts roulants, sur lequel sont susceptibles de se déplacer selon une direction perpendiculaire à la translation de l'unité (7), au moins deux ensembles de levage et de manutention montés chacun sur un chariot (11, 12, 13). Lesdits chariots sont susceptibles de se translater sur ladite unité l'un en dessus de l'autre pour ainsi permettre leur croisement respectif. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 17/06; C25C 3/14; B66C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 11/00 (2006.01); B66C 17/00 (2006.01); C25C 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/10 (2013.01); B66C 11/00 (2013.01); B66C 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] FR 2553923 A1 19850426 - WIEDERAUFARBEITUNG VON KERNBRE [DE]
  • [A] EP 0618313 A2 19941005 - TECHMO CAR SPA [IT]
  • [A] DE 19740513 A1 19990318 - TAX INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT MBH [DE]
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198549, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M21, AN 1985-307255, XP002142428 & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 070 (M - 462) 19 March 1986 (1986-03-19)PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN19860319010070(M - 462)JPS60213622A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101726 A1 20010523; EP 1101726 B1 20050209; AT 288873 T 20050215; DE 60018020 D1 20050317; DE 60018020 T2 20051229; ES 2234546 T3 20050701; FR 2801295 A1 20010525; FR 2801295 B1 20011221; NO 20005805 A 20010521; NO 20005805 D0 20001117; NO 321743 B1 20060626

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-06-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: REEL

- Effective date: 20051031

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ASMI

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-09-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234546 T3

2005-05-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-04-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018020 P 20050317

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REEL

2005-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASMI

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040224

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI