Global Patent Index - EP 1101750 A1

EP 1101750 A1 2001-05-23 - Method of preparing an aluminum nitride substrate for bonding with a copper layer

Title (en)

Method of preparing an aluminum nitride substrate for bonding with a copper layer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Vorbereitung eines AIuminiumnitridsubstrates auf die Verbindung mit einer Kupferschicht

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'un substrat en nitrure d'aluminium pour l'assemblage avec une couche en cuivre

Publication

EP 1101750 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890288 A

Priority

AT 194599 A

Abstract (en)

Aluminum nitride substrate preparation for direct copper bonding (DCB), by heating in an oxygen-rich atmosphere at above atmospheric pressure, is new. An AlN substrate is prepared for DCB to a copper layer by heating in an oxygen-containing atmosphere to form an Al2O3 surface layer, the atmosphere having an oxygen excess produced by applying an excess pressure preferably of 1.2-10 bars. Preferred Features: The substrate is heated for 1-20 min. or 1-20 sec. in an atmosphere consisting entirely or partially of O2 or O3.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Vorbereitung eines AlN-Substrates auf die Verbindung mit einer Kupferschicht mittels eines Direct-Copper-Bonding- (DCB-)Verfahrens, wobei auf der mit der Kupferschicht zu verbindenden Oberfläche des AlN-Substrates Al2O3 durch Erhitzen des AlN-Substrates in sauerstoffhältiger Atmosphäre gebildet wird und in dieser Atmosphäre ein Sauerstoff-Überangebot hergestellt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 37/02 (2006.01); H05K 3/38 (2006.01); H05K 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05K 3/38 (2013.01); C04B 37/021 (2013.01); C04B 2237/366 (2013.01); C04B 2237/407 (2013.01); C04B 2237/525 (2013.01); C04B 2237/54 (2013.01); H05K 1/0306 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0170012 A2 19860205 - BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]
  • [X] DE 4104860 A1 19910822 - TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]
  • [X] W.L. CHIANG ET AL.: "Effect of substrate and pretreatment on copper to AlN direct bonds", CERAMIC ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE PROCEEDINGS, vol. 12, no. 9/10, 1991, Westerville, OH, US, pages 2105 - 2114, XP000266408
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 199833, Derwent World Patents Index; AN 1998-381202, XP002157833

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101750 A1 20010523; EP 1101750 B1 20031203; AT 407987 B 20010725; AT A194599 A 20001215; DE 50004642 D1 20040115

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50004642

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-09-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROGERS GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CURAMIK ELECTRONICS GMBH, 92676 ESCHENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50004642

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004642

- Representative's name: GRAF GLUECK KRITZENBERGER, DE

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004642

- Representative's name: GLUECK - KRITZENBERGER PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004642

- Representative's name: GRAF GLUECK KRITZENBERGER, DE

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROGERS GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ELECTROVAC, FABRIKATION ELEKTROTECHNISCHER SPEZIALARTIKEL GES.M.B.H., KLOSTERNEUBURG, AT

- Document: DE 50004642

- Effective date: 20110504

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070920

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070920

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-05 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060208

2004-11-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LXYS SEMICONDUCTOR GMBH

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-09-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040122

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004642 P 20040115

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI