Global patent index - EP 1101751 A1

EP 1101751 A1 2001-05-23 - Insensitive compressed explosive mixtures

Title (en)

Insensitive compressed explosive mixtures

Title (de)

Gepresste unempfindliche Sprengstoffmischungen

Title (fr)

Mélanges explosifs insensibles comprimés

Publication

EP 1101751 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124027 A

Priority

DE 19955657 A

Abstract (en)

A non-sensitive, pressed explosive mixture comprises a sonochemically formed 1,3,5 triamino-2,4,6-trinitrobenzol binder. The mixture is mixed and pressed without the need for an assisting material and without additives.

Abstract (de)

Ein uneingeschränkt transportierbarer Sprengstoff weist eine Bindermatrix aus sonochemisch hergestellten Feinst-TATB auf.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 25/04; C06B 25/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 21/00 (2006.01); C06B 25/04 (2006.01); C06B 25/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 25/04 (2013.01); C06B 21/0041 (2013.01); C06B 25/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5597974 A 19970128 - VORECK JR WALLACE E [US], et al
  • [A] US 4481371 A 19841106 - BENZIGER THEODORE M [US]
  • [A] US 4251301 A 19810217 - VOIGT JR H WILLIAM
  • [A] US 4394197 A 19830719 - KABIK IRVING, et al
  • [A] US 3222231 A 19651207 - MARKELS JR MICHAEL, et al
  • [A] US 5035363 A 19910730 - SOMOZA CARLOS [US]
  • [Y] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 129, no. 10, 7 September 1998, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 124495s, J. BREMSER ET AL.: "Characterization of sonochemically-animated 1,3,5-triamino-2,4,6-trinitrobenzene" page 788; XP000786189 & Int. Annu. Conf. ICT 1998, 29th(Energetic Materials), 13.1-13.13, Fraunhofer-Institut fuer Chemische Technologie
  • [Y] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 129, no. 11, 14 September 1998, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 138150n, K.-Y. LEE ET AL.: "Synthesis and initiation spot-size testing of sonochemically animated TATB" page 813; XP000786239 & Int. Annu. Conf. ICT, 1998, 29th(Energetic Materials), 177.1-177.14, Fraunhofer-Institut fuer Chemische Technologie

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101751 A1 20010523; DE 19955657 A1 20010523; NO 20005655 A 20010521; NO 20005655 D0 20001109; NO 316914 B1 20040621

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140603

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI