Global Patent Index - EP 1101772 A1

EP 1101772 A1 2001-05-23 - Antibody specific to interleukin 18 precursor

Title (en)

Antibody specific to interleukin 18 precursor

Title (de)

Antikörper spezifisch für den Interleukin-18 Vorläufer

Title (fr)

Anticorps contre le précurseur de l'interleukine-18

Publication

EP 1101772 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00310121 A

Priority

JP 32486099 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed are an antibody specific to interleukin 18 (IL-18) precursor, preparation processes therefor, and uses thereof. The antibody includes immunoglobulins in both forms of polyclonal and monoclonal antibodies which exhibits an immunoreactivity against IL-18 precursor at an intensity higher than against other substances. The antibody is useful in detection and purification of IL-18 precursor and in elimination and detoxification of the precursor accumulated in vivo. The detection method using the antibody is effective in qualitative and quantitative analyses for the precursor as well as in correction of imprecise results caused by assays using anti-IL-18 antibody which exhibits a cross reactivity against the precursor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/24; C12N 5/20; G01N 33/577; G01N 33/68; A61K 39/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/24 (2006.01); C12N 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/244 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); Y02A 50/412 (2018.01); Y02A 50/58 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0850952 A1 19980701 - HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]
  • [A] EP 0821005 A2 19980128 - HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]
  • [A] WO 9810072 A1 19980312 - CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]
  • [A] WO 9909063 A1 19990225 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al
  • [A] M. TANIGUCHI ET AL.: "Characterization of anti-human interleukin-18 (IL-18)/interferon-gamma-inducing factor (IGIF) monoclonal antibodies and their application in the measurement of human IL-18 by ELISA.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, vol. 206, no. 1-2, 1997, Amsterdam, The Netherlands, pages 107 - 113, XP004088140
  • [DA] K. AKITA ET AL.: "Involvement of caspase-1 and caspase-3 in the production and procesing of mature human interleukin-18 in monocytic THP.1 cells.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 272, no. 42, 17 October 1997 (1997-10-17), Baltimore, MD, USA, pages 26595 - 26603, XP002159798
  • [DA] H. OKAMURA ET AL.: "Cloning of a new cytokine that induces IFN-gamma production by T cells.", NATURE, vol. 378, no. 6552, 2 November 1995 (1995-11-02), London, GB, pages 88 - 91, XP002024313
  • [DA] S. USHIO ET AL.: "Cloning of the cDNA for human IFN-gamma-inducing factor, expression in Escherichia coli, and studies on the biologic activities of the protein.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 156, no. 11, 1 June 1996 (1996-06-01), Baltimore, MD, USA, pages 4274 - 4279, XP002022861

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101772 A1 20010523; EP 1101772 B1 20090121; CA 2324168 A1 20010516; DE 60041432 D1 20090312; US 2006073519 A1 20060406

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101115

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60041432

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60041432

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101115

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091015

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-12-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091022

2009-03-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60041432 P 20090312

2009-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI