Global Patent Index - EP 1101784 A2

EP 1101784 A2 2001-05-23 - Aliphatic thermoplastic polyurethanes, process for their preparation and their use

Title (en)

Aliphatic thermoplastic polyurethanes, process for their preparation and their use

Title (de)

Aliphatische thermoplastische Polyurethane, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung

Title (fr)

Polyuréthanes aliphatiques thermoplastiques, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation

Publication

EP 1101784 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124210 A

Priority

US 44702599 A

Abstract (en)

Thermoplastic polyurethane has an abrasion resistance and elongation at break at least 60% of the initial values after storage in heat and at least 80% after hydrolysis storage at 80 degrees C for 7 days, a Tg of at most -50 degrees C and a Shore A hardness of 70-95. Thermoplastic polyurethane (PU) has an abrasion resistance and elongation at break at least 60% of the initial values after storage in heat and at least 80% after hydrolysis storage at 80 degrees C for 7 days, a Tg of at most -50 degrees C and a Shore A hardness of 70-95. Independent claims are included for the continuous production of the above PU by mixing the polyol(s) and chain extender and mixing with diisocyanate(s) within 5 s at 60-50 degrees C and optionally granulating and molded articles made from the above PU.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft aliphatische thermoplastische Polyurethane mit verbesserten Eigenschaften, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 18/66; C08G 18/73; C08G 18/75

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 37/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/16 (2006.01); C08G 18/10 (2006.01); C08G 18/65 (2006.01); C08G 18/66 (2006.01); C08G 18/73 (2006.01); C08G 18/75 (2006.01); C08J 5/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/00 (2006.01); C08L 75/04 (2006.01); C08L 75/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/73 (2013.01); C08G 18/6607 (2013.01); C08G 18/758 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101784 A2 20010523; EP 1101784 A3 20011107; EP 1101784 B1 20070613; AT 364647 T 20070715; CA 2326365 A1 20010522; CA 2326365 C 20090113; DE 50014405 D1 20070726; DK 1101784 T3 20070910; ES 2286970 T3 20071216; JP 2001200155 A 20010724; JP 4627866 B2 20110209; KR 100670886 B1 20070118; KR 20010051840 A 20010625; MX 220870 B 20040609; MX PA00011301 A 20020315; US 2001053841 A1 20011220; US 6559266 B2 20030506

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170608 AND 20170614

2017-03-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-03-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG, DE

- Effective date: 20170201

2016-10-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 364647 T

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-05-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US; COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50014405

2016-05-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: COVESTRO LLC, PITTSBURGH, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US; COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50014405

2016-05-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014405

- Representative's name: LEVPAT, DE

2016-02-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US; BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, 40789 MONHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50014405

2016-02-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US; BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, 40789 MONHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50014405

2016-02-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: COVESTRO LLC, PITTSBURGH, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US; BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, 40789 MONHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50014405

2016-02-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014405

- Representative's name: LEVPAT, DE

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131110

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141027

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BAYER CORP.

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE A.G.

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AKTIENGES, BAYER CORP., , US

- Document: DE 50014405

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER CORP., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AKTIENGES, BAYER CORP., , US

- Document: DE 50014405

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AKTIENGES, BAYER CORP., , US

- Document: DE 50014405

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE; BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US

- Document: DE 50014405

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE; BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US

- Document: DE 50014405

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE; BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US

- Document: DE 50014405

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: COVESTRO LLC, PITTSBURGH, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE; BAYER CORP., PITTSBURGH, PA., US

- Document: DE 50014405

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014405

- Representative's name: FELDHUES, MICHAEL, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014405

- Representative's name: LEVPAT, DE

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-03-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014405

- Representative's name: FELDHUES, MICHAEL, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121116

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20121112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070613

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071109

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070613

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070613

2008-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070613

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071113

2008-01-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2286970 T3

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070913

2007-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-09-10 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2007-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014405 P 20070726

2007-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050214

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CORPORATION

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020507

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI