Global Patent Index - EP 1101812 A1

EP 1101812 A1 2001-05-23 - METHOD FOR CONVERTING CHLORINE-CONTAINING WASTE PLASTIC TO OIL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONVERTING CHLORINE-CONTAINING WASTE PLASTIC TO OIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON CHLORHALTIGEN PLASTIKABFÄLLEN ZU ÖL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR TRANSFORMER EN PETROLE DES DECHETS PLASTIQUES CONTENANT DU CHLORE

Publication

EP 1101812 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926929 A

Priority

  • JP 9903612 W
  • JP 19285998 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided an oilification process for chlorine-based plastic waste characterized in that a mixture of plastic waste including chlorine-based plastic and an aqueous solution containing carbonate of an alkali metal or hydroxide or carbonate of an alkali earth metal or several kinds of these compounds, in which the concentration of dissolved oxygen is controlled so as to be not higher than 0.5 mg/liter, is heated; chlorine in the plastic waste is released during a process of transfer to a supercritical condition and/or under a supercritical condition; and the plastic waste is decomposed, or characterized in that an aqueous solution containing carbonate of an alkali metal or hydroxide or carbonate of an alkali earth metal or several kinds of these compounds is heated; melted plastic waste including chorine-based plastic is mixed in the aqueous solution during a process of transfer to a supercritical condition and/or under a supercritical condition; the concentration of dissolved oxygen in the aqueous solution is controlled so as to be not higher than 0.5 mg/liter before or during the mixing of the plastic waste; chlorine in the plastic waste mixed in the aqueous solution is released; and the plastic waste is decomposed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 1/10; B09B 3/00; C10J 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 1/04 (2006.01); C10G 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 1/04 (2013.01); C10G 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101812 A1 20010523; EP 1101812 A4 20040721; EP 1101812 B1 20051005; DE 69927596 D1 20060216; JP 3586648 B2 20041110; TW 585905 B 20040501; WO 0002977 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927596 P 20060216

2006-01-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060106

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040607

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE