Global Patent Index - EP 1101825 A1

EP 1101825 A1 2001-05-23 - Refractory, ceramic gas flushing brick

Title (en)

Refractory, ceramic gas flushing brick

Title (de)

Feuerfester keramischer Gasspülstein

Title (fr)

Brique réfractaire, céramique pour lavage aux gaz

Publication

EP 1101825 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00120224 A

Priority

DE 19954918 A

Abstract (en)

Refractory ceramic gas rinsing stone (10) comprises a ceramic body (12) with non-directive porosity extending from one gas inlet end (12u) to a gas outlet side front surface (10s) of the stone; and a gas-tight ceramic material (20) surrounding the ceramic body in the region of its periphery surface. A slit-like gas channel (22) is formed in the boundary surface between the ceramic body and the gas-tight ceramic material and/or within the ceramic body. The gas channel extends from a gas inlet end up to the a gas outlet side front surface of the stone. Preferred Features: The ceramic body is divided in the gas inlet direction. The gas channel is formed between corresponding surface sections of neighboring parts of the body.

Abstract (de)

Feuerfeste keramische Gasspülstein (10) mit mindestens einem keramischen Körper (12) mit ungerichteter Porosität, der sich von einem gaszuführseitigen Ende (12u) bis zu einer gasauslaßseitigen Stirnfläche (10s) des Gasspülsteins (10) erstreckt, einem gasdichten keramischen Material (20), welches den keramischen Körper (12) mindestens im Bereich seiner Umfangsfläche umgibt, wobei im Grenzflächenbereich zwischen dem keramischen Körper (12) und dem gasdichten keramischen Material (20) und/oder innerhalb des keramischen Körpers (12) mindestens ein schlitzförmiger Gaskanal (22) ausgebildet ist, der sich von einem gaszuführseitigen Ende (12u) bis zu der gasauslaßseitigen Stirnfläche (10s) des Gasspülsteins (12) erstreckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 7/072; B22D 1/00; F27D 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/16 (2006.01); C21C 5/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 3/16 (2013.01); B22D 1/005 (2013.01); C21C 5/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101825 A1 20010523; EP 1101825 B1 20030716; AT 245202 T 20030815; DE 19954918 A1 20010531; DE 19954918 C2 20010920; ES 2201981 T3 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: VEITSCH-RADEX GMBH & CO. OG, AT

- Document: AT 245202 T

- Effective date: 20120327

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201981 T3

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002898 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VEITSCH-RADEX GMBH & CO

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010428

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI