Global Patent Index - EP 1101826 A1

EP 1101826 A1 2001-05-23 - Quenching process after low pressure carburising

Title (en)

Quenching process after low pressure carburising

Title (de)

Abschreckverfahren nach Niederdruck-Aufkohlung

Title (fr)

Procédé de trempe après cémentation à basse pression

Publication

EP 1101826 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410142 A

Priority

  • FR 9914449 A
  • US 71552500 A

Abstract (en)

A method for quenching steel components after being subjected to a heat treatment process, such as cementation, at low pressure (Pcem), is characterised in that it consists of submitting the components to a flow of air at an elevated pressure (Ptrem), of between 5 and 50 bars. The duration of the hardening process is below 15 minutes and preferably less than 2 minutes. The heat treatment installation using this method for treating steel components is also claimed and incorporates a plurality of treatment cells and handling equipment for transferring the components between the different treatment cells.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de trempe de pièces d'acier ayant subi un traitement thermique à faible pression (Pcem) et une installation de traitement thermique, qui consiste à soumettre les pièces à un flux d'air à pression élevée (Ptrem). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/613; C21D 9/00; C23C 8/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/613 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C23C 8/22 (2006.01); C23C 8/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/0062 (2013.01); C21D 1/613 (2013.01); C23C 8/22 (2013.01); C23C 8/80 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] FR 2678287 A1 19921231 - ETUDES CONST MECANIQUES [FR]
  • [AD] FR 2771754 A1 19990604 - ETUDES CONST MECANIQUES [FR]
  • [A] DE 4208485 C1 19930211
  • [A] DE 3736501 C1 19880609 - DEGUSSA
  • [Y] ALTENA H: "NIEDERDRUCK-AUFKOHLUNG MIT HOCHDRUCK-GASABSCHRECKUNG VERFAHRENSTECHNIK UND ERGEBNISSE", HAERTEREI TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN,DE,CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, vol. 53, no. 2, 1 March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 93 - 101, XP000755093, ISSN: 0341-101X
  • [Y] HOFFMANN R ET AL: "MOEGLICHKEITEN UND GRENZEN DER GASABKUEHLUNG", HAERTEREI TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN,DE,CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, vol. 47, no. 2, 1 March 1992 (1992-03-01), pages 112 - 122, XP000267300, ISSN: 0341-101X
  • [A] TINSCHER R ET AL: "FIXTURHAERTUNG VON WAELZLAGERRINGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GASFOERMIGEN ABSCHRECKMEDIEN", HAERTEREI TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN,DE,CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, vol. 53, no. 2, 1 March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 108 - 115, XP000755095, ISSN: 0341-101X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101826 A1 20010523; FR 2801059 A1 20010518; FR 2801059 B1 20020125; US 6451137 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040212

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI