Global Patent Index - EP 1101827 A1

EP 1101827 A1 2001-05-23 - Process for ultrasonic shotpeening large annular surfaces of thinwalled workpieces

Title (en)

Process for ultrasonic shotpeening large annular surfaces of thinwalled workpieces

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ultraschall-Kugelstahlen von grossformatigen ringförmigen Oberflächen von dünnwandigen Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé de grenaillage par ultrasons de surfaces annulaires de grandes dimensions sur des pièces minces

Publication

EP 1101827 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403183 A

Priority

FR 9914481 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a method for ultrasonic shot blasting of large-dimensioned annular surfaces (5) on thin workpieces (1). Said method is characterised in that the surface to be shot blasted (5) performs at least N = five revolutions in front of the shot blaster opening (10) during the shot blasting process, so as to reduce the deformations of the workpiece (1).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose un procédé de grenaillage dit "par ultrasons" pour grenailler des surfaces (5) annulaires de grandes dimensions sur des pièces (1) minces. Un tel procédé est remarquable en ce que la surface à grenailler (5) effectue au moins N = cinq révolutions devant l'ouverture (13) de l'enceinte de grenaillage (10) pendant le grenaillage, afin de réduire les déformations de la pièce (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/10 (2006.01); C21D 7/06 (2006.01); C21D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 5/005 (2013.01); B24C 1/10 (2013.01); C21D 7/06 (2013.01); C21D 1/04 (2013.01); Y10T 29/479 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101827 A1 20010523; EP 1101827 B1 20050126; CA 2325897 A1 20010518; CA 2325897 C 20070918; DE 60017681 D1 20050303; DE 60017681 T2 20051222; ES 2233310 T3 20050616; FR 2801322 A1 20010525; FR 2801322 B1 20020208; JP 2001170866 A 20010626; JP 4267199 B2 20090527; RU 2210602 C2 20030820; UA 66403 C2 20011015; US 6289705 B1 20010918; WO 0136692 A1 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES, FR

- Effective date: 20170717

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131117

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-09-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SNECMA

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233310 T3

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017681 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031127

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI