Global Patent Index - EP 1101832 A1

EP 1101832 A1 2001-05-23 - Method for the combinatorial production of a library of materials

Title (en)

Method for the combinatorial production of a library of materials

Title (de)

Verfahren zur kombinatorischen Herstellung einer Biblithek von Materialien

Title (fr)

Procédé de production combinatoire d'une bibliothèque de matériaux

Publication

EP 1101832 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124345 A

Priority

DE 19955789 A

Abstract (en)

Production of a library of materials in the form of a two dimensional matrix in the surface region of a flat substrate comprises spraying two different material components from at least two spray nozzles at a distance from the substrate onto the same side of the substrate so that materials with different compositions can be obtained in different surface regions of the substrate. An Independent claim is also included for a process for testing libraries of materials comprising investigating single defined sites of the substrate and analyzing the composition of the sites. Preferred Features: The sprayable material components are selected from solutions, emulsions, suspensions or powders of group IB, IIB, IIIB, IVB, VB, VIB, VIIB or VII, lanthanides, actinides, IA, IIA, IIIA, IVA, VA, VIA elements.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben ist ein Verfahren zur kombinatorischen Herstellung einer Bibliothek von Materialien in Form einer zweidimensionalen Matrix im Oberflächenbereich eines flächigen Substrats, bei dem mindestens zwei unterschiedliche sprühfähige Materialkomponenten aus mindestens zwei Sprühdüsen, die vom Substrat und voneinander beabstandet sind, auf dieselbe Seite des Substrats gesprüht werden, so daß in unterschiedlichen Oberflächenbereichen des Substrats Materialien mit unterschiedlicher Zusammensetzung erhalten werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/00; B01J 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/01 (2016.01); C40B 40/18 (2006.01); C40B 60/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/0046 (2013.01); C23C 4/01 (2016.01); B01J 2219/00443 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00486 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00527 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00585 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0059 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00596 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00605 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00612 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00621 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00641 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00659 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00702 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00745 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0075 (2013.01); C40B 40/18 (2013.01); C40B 60/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101832 A1 20010523; EP 1101832 B1 20070418; DE 19955789 A1 20010523; DE 50014259 D1 20070531

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091117

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091117

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HTE A.G. THE HIGH THROUGHPUT EXPERIMENTATION COMP

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081203

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080121

2008-02-20 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: HIBST, HARTMUT, PROF. DR.

2008-02-20 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHUNK, STEPHAN

2008-02-20 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: STERZEL, HANS-JOSEF, DR.

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014259 P 20070531

2007-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2005-10-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HTE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT THE HIGH THROUGHPUTEXPERIME

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030415

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI