Global Patent Index - EP 1101838 A1

EP 1101838 A1 2001-05-23 - Method of management in the operation of a molten salt aluminium electrolysis plant and aluminium production plant managed by this method

Title (en)

Method of management in the operation of a molten salt aluminium electrolysis plant and aluminium production plant managed by this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betriebsablauf einer Aluminium-Schmelzflusselektrolyseanlage und mit diesem Verfahren betriebene Aluminium-Herstellungsanlage

Title (fr)

Méthode de gestion du fonctionnement d'une installation de production d'aluminium par électrolyse ignée et installation de production d'aluminium mettant en oeuvre cette méthode

Publication

EP 1101838 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420230 A

Priority

  • EP 99420230 A
  • AU 6178099 A
  • CA 2291497 A
  • NO 995855 A
  • US 45697499 A

Abstract (en)

An operation of a plant having a set of two electrolysis tankrooms (2,3) with series of tanks is managed by carrying handling operations at each tank in a closed loop. The machines (13,14) are moved over all the tanks in a continuous cycle. The tankrooms are parallel and symmetrical to a central passageway (4) for handling of the liquid-aluminum tapping ladles. An Independent claim is also included for a plant for the production of aluminum.

Abstract (fr)

Cette méthode de gestion du fonctionnement d'une installation de production d'aluminium par électrolyse ignée du type comportant un ensemble (2, 3) de deux halls d'électrolyse comportant chacun une série de cuves, lesdits halls étant parallèles et symétriques l'un de l'autre par rapport à une allée centrale (4) au niveau de laquelle s'effectue la manutention des poches de coulée d'aluminium liquide, consiste à assurer les différentes opérations de manutention au niveau de chacune des cuves, nécessaires au fonctionnement de l'installation, selon une boucle fermée, les organes (13, 13', 13", 13"', 14, 14', 14", 14"') nécessaires audit fonctionnement se translatant au niveau de l'ensemble des cuves des deux halls selon des cycles continus. L'invention concerne également l'installation pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0618313 A2 19941005 - TECHMO CAR SPA [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101838 A1 20010523; EP 1101838 B1 20100818; AT 478175 T 20100915; AU 6178099 A 20010531; CA 2291497 A1 20010601; CA 2291497 C 20110222; DE 69942692 D1 20100930; NO 322556 B1 20061023; NO 995855 A 20010530; NO 995855 D0 19991129; US 6319388 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161119

2017-11-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161119

2016-11-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101119

2011-09-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69942692

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: REEL

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALU CONSEIL INGENIERIE SERVICE

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101119

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-03-16 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-02-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101220

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100818

2010-12-08 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100818

2010-10-20 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2346830 T3

2010-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69942692 P 20100930

2010-09-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2010-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2010-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: REEL

2010-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALU CONSEIL INGENIERIE SERVICE

2009-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090519

2008-05-21 [19F] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20080701

2002-09-04 [19A] STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI