Global Patent Index - EP 1101849 A1

EP 1101849 A1 2001-05-23 - Texturing jet

Title (en)

Texturing jet

Title (de)

Texturierdüse

Title (fr)

Buse de texturation

Publication

EP 1101849 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00811045 A

Priority

DE 19955227 A

Abstract (en)

A stuffer box has a feed section (14) where yarn is forwarded by a steam or hot air jet into a yarn plug section (16, 18). Towards the exit the yarn plug is guided forward against a movable surface, e.g. a drum (22), while still restrained, e.g. by the sides of a groove (24) and a curved extension (20) of one side of the stuffer box. The drum (22) is perforated with interior suction. An Independent claim is also included for a process using a movable surface at the exit from the stuffer box that retains the shape of the yarn plug for some distance while subjecting it to reduced surface friction.

Abstract (de)

In einer Texturiereinrichtung mit einer Düse (10) mit einem Einlaufteil (12), einem Förderteil (14), einem Stauchteil (16) und einem Führungsteil (18, 20), wobei zwischen Einlaufteil (12) und Förderteil (14) heisse Luft oder Dampf in einen Führungskanal für Garn eingeleitet wird, welche im Bereich des Stauchteils (16) austreten kann, ist das texturierte Garn bzw. der Pfropfen nach dem Verlassen des Stauchteils (16) bzw. nach der Stauchzone im Bereich einer bewegten Oberfläche (22) führbar, wobei kraftschlüssige Haltemittel (24) vorgesehen sind, welche so ausgebildet sind, dass die Gestalt des Pfropfens, so wie sie sich im Stauchteil (16) ergibt, vorübergehend erhalten bleibt. Die Texturiereinrichtung ist insbesondere dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass bei einer Maximallänge des Stauchteils von 60 mm ein Führungsteil max. der selben Länge angeschlossen ist, in dem das texturierte Garn in der Form eines Pfropfens zur Oberfläche einer Trommel (22) führbar ist, und dass anschliessend an diesen ersten Führungsteil (18) nach einer Umlenkung ein zweiter Führungsteil (20) entlang der Oberfläche der Trommel (22) vorgesehen ist, in dem das texturierte Garn einerseits in radialer Richtung als auch in axialer Richtung der Trommel (22) geführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101849 A1 20010523; EP 1101849 B1 20070523; DE 19955227 A1 20010523; DE 50014343 D1 20070705

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG, CH

2013-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRUETZSCHLER SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG, WINTERTHUR, CH

- Document: DE 50014343

- Effective date: 20130211

2012-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TRUETZSCHLER SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG, CH

2008-04-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080226

2007-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014343 P 20070705

2007-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2002-02-06 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20011121

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI