Global Patent Index - EP 1101851 A1

EP 1101851 A1 2001-05-23 - Compensating weft brake

Title (en)

Compensating weft brake

Title (de)

Schussfadenaussgleichsbremse

Title (fr)

Frein compensateur de fil de trame

Publication

EP 1101851 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00124236 A

Priority

IT TO991008 A

Abstract (en)

A compensating weft brake, comprising a brake body (20) which is crossed by a thread (F) and to which two oscillating arms (21-22) are articulated; the arms are kinematically coupled and actuated by an elastic means so as to divaricate; each arm has a plurality of ceramic thread guiding rings (24) which form a zigzag thread path. Each ring is rigidly coupled to the respective arm of the brake by a corresponding fork-like support which has a fork opening (26) for inserting the ring; the fork-like supports (25') have at least one continuous annular support wall directed towards the inner side of the arms (21-22) in order to react to the radial forces applied by the respective thread guiding rings (24) and discharge them onto the corresponding arm (21-22) of the brake in order to prevent the accidental separation of the thread guiding ring (24) from the respective support (25'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 59/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); B65H 59/32 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 59/32 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101851 A1 20010523; EP 1101851 B1 20040818; DE 60013067 D1 20040923; DE 60013067 T2 20050210; IT 1311453 B1 20020312; IT TO991008 A1 20010521; IT TO991008 D0 19991119

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [REG BE MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171130

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091111

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60013067 P 20040923

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE LI SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI