Global Patent Index - EP 1101852 A1

EP 1101852 A1 2001-05-23 - Method for controlling tension of warp

Title (en)

Method for controlling tension of warp

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung der Kettspannung

Title (fr)

Méthode de contrôle de la tension de la chaîne

Publication

EP 1101852 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00123397 A

Priority

  • JP 33068399 A
  • JP 2000197743 A

Abstract (en)

In a method for controlling the tension of a warp for production of a textile with the number of crossing of the warp with respect to the weft smaller in one part compared with the other part of the textile in the width direction, a warp (3) corresponding to one part with a small number of crossing and a warp (2) corresponding to the other part with a large number of crossing are drawn out from a warp beam (4) and are placed on different rolls (5,6), and the roll (6) dedicated to the warp (3) corresponding to one part is movably provided in the direction crossing with the axis of the roll (6). The method includes the steps of: temporarily reducing the tension of the warp (3) corresponding to one part via the dedicated roll (6) immediately before beating; increasing the tension of the warp (3) corresponding to one part via the dedicated roll (6) after beating so as to regain a target tension value; detecting the position of the dedicated roll (6); calculating the deviation of the detected position and a preset target position; and correcting at least one of the degree of reducing the tension and the target tension value so as to decrease the deviation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/12; D03D 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/04 (2006.01); D03D 49/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/04 (2013.01); D03D 49/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] US 6070619 A 20000606 - TAMURA ZENJI [JP], et al
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 183 (C - 0936) 6 May 1992 (1992-05-06)
  • [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 02 29 February 2000 (2000-02-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 01 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101852 A1 20010523; EP 1101852 B1 20040804; DE 60012664 D1 20040909; DE 60012664 T2 20050728; JP 2001207352 A 20010803; JP 3466547 B2 20031110

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60012664

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TSUDAKOMA KOGYO K.K.

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012664 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE IT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI