Global Patent Index - EP 1101853 A1

EP 1101853 A1 2001-05-23 - A method for preparing a product of angora fibre, a product made of angora fibre, and the use of a product made of angora fibre

Title (en)

A method for preparing a product of angora fibre, a product made of angora fibre, and the use of a product made of angora fibre

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Angorafaserproduktes, Produkte aus Angorafaser, und Anwendung eines Angorafaserproduktes

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'un produit en fibres d'angora, un produit en fibres d'angora et utilisation d'un produit en fibres d'angora

Publication

EP 1101853 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00660208 A

Priority

FI 19992479 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a method for preparing a felt product of fibres, of which at least some are angora fibres, and in which method the fibres are formed into a planar sheet. The fibres are found to each other by mechanical binding and the produced non-woven fabric is then finished to a felt product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/08; D04H 1/10; D04H 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/08 (2012.01); D04H 1/10 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/46 (2012.01); D04H 1/492 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/09 (2013.01); D04H 1/08 (2013.01); D04H 1/10 (2013.01); D04H 1/4391 (2013.01); D04H 1/46 (2013.01); D04H 1/492 (2013.01); D04H 1/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101853 A1 20010523; FI 117760 B 20070215; FI 19992479 A 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090520

2008-04-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080401

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20011113;LT PAYMENT 20011113;LV PAYMENT 20011113;MK PAYMENT 20011113;RO PAYMENT 20011113;SI PAYMENT 20011113

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI