Global Patent Index - EP 1101854 A1

EP 1101854 A1 2001-05-23 - Nonwoven fabric of polypropylene fiber and process for making the same

Title (en)

Nonwoven fabric of polypropylene fiber and process for making the same

Title (de)

Vliesstoff aus Polypropylen und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Non tissé de polypropylène et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1101854 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00310313 A

Priority

JP 33179399 A

Abstract (en)

A nonwoven fabric 26 is formed by continuous fibers 15 of polypropylene having a fineness of 0.006 - 5.8 d, a birefringence of 0.019 - 0.030 and a tensile breaking extension of 100 - 300 %. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/08 (2006.01); D01D 5/08 (2006.01); D01F 6/06 (2006.01); D04H 3/007 (2012.01); D04H 3/033 (2012.01); D04H 3/11 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/06 (2013.01); D04H 3/11 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101854 A1 20010523; EP 1101854 B1 20071107; AU 7173900 A 20010524; AU 765499 B2 20030918; BR 0005847 A 20010724; BR 0005847 B1 20111227; CA 2326263 A1 20010522; CA 2326263 C 20061205; CN 1237218 C 20060118; CN 1297075 A 20010530; DE 60036994 D1 20071220; DE 60036994 T2 20080828; ID 28425 A 20010524; JP 2001146670 A 20010529; JP 3662455 B2 20050622; KR 20010060339 A 20010706; SG 87192 A1 20020319; TW 487756 B 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-18 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20101119

2011-05-18 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20101119

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101011

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20080801

2010-11-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-09-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-09-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-09-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-08-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071107

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080207

2007-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036994 P 20071220

2007-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2007-11-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNI-CHARM CORPORATION

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI