Global Patent Index - EP 1101861 A2

EP 1101861 A2 2001-05-23 - Pressing arrangement

Title (en)

Pressing arrangement

Title (de)

Pressenanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pressage

Publication

EP 1101861 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120687 A

Priority

DE 19955029 A

Abstract (en)

The press section of a papermaking/cardboard prodn. machine, where water is extracted from the wet web, has at least one shoe press (10) where two blankets pass through with the web. At the outlet of the shoe press, the two blankets (24,26) together with the web (12) between them pass around the end of the press shoe at least partially. The length of the press shoe (20) is ≤ 350 mm, along the direction (L) of web travel. The two blankets (24,26), and the web (12) between them, emerge from the end of the press shoe at an angle ( alpha ) of ≤ 110 degrees or ≤ 115 degrees or 90-105 degrees or ≤ 90 degrees to the plane (28) through the center of the press force. The press gap (18) is formed between the press shoe (20) unit and especially a shoe press roller (14) and the facing shoe press counter roller, which has a dia. of ≥ 1000 mm or ≥ 1300 mm. The outlet end of the press shoe (20) has a curve radius (R) of 20-100 mm. At least two shoe press stations are deployed in succession, in the direction (L) of web travel, where two blankets with the web pass through at least one of them.

Abstract (de)

Eine Pressenanordnung 32 zur Behandlung einer Faserstoffbahn 12 wie insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn umfaßt wenigstens eine doppelt befilzte Schuhpresse 10, an deren Spaltauslauf die beiden Filzbänder 24, 26 zusammen mit der dazwischenliegenden Faserstoffbahn 12 das betreffende Preßschuhende zumindest teilweise umschlingen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0218 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01); D21F 3/045 (2013.01); F26B 13/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19955029 A1 20010517; EP 1101861 A2 20010523; EP 1101861 A3 20011114

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110401

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI