Global Patent Index - EP 1101863 A2

EP 1101863 A2 2001-05-23 - Method and device for removing dust from a moving paper web

Title (en)

Method and device for removing dust from a moving paper web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Staubabtrennung von einer laufenden Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour enlever de la poussière d'une bande de papier en défilement

Publication

EP 1101863 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124067 A

Priority

AT 195099 A

Abstract (en)

To separate and extract dust from a moving web, especially of tissue paper, the layer of air carried by the moving web is deflected away from the web surface and extracted by suction. It is passed through a separation box which extracts the air evenly across the web width. At the same time, the air carried by the web is separated from its under side by suction. When the dust-laden air is removed, it is replaced by ambient air to prevent the formation of eddies. The web is stabilized before the carried air is separated, and air carried by the stabilizer is led away. An Independent claim is included for an assembly to free the moving tissue paper web of dust with an initial separation box (9) as a stabilizer across the web width, with a curved guide surface (18) for the web (4). A surface air deflector is at the entry side of the separation box (9), to direct the air into a collection channel (21) at the separation box (9). The collection channel (21) has an expanding cross section towards the drive side of the papermaking machine. An adjustable suction slit (19) is at the entry side (18') of the separation box (9). The separation box can be opened across the whole width. A second separation box (10) is under the web (4), where the web runs into it at a small angle pref. of 1-5 degrees and such as 1-2 degrees . The second separation box (10) has a deflection plate (23), pref. with a swing movement, and the box is divided into at least two chambers. A stabilizer (8) is in front of the leading separation box (9), which spreads the paper web (4) across its width, pref. with a swing movement. A funnel-shaped suction hood is at the zone of the scraper (6), on the machine drive side. A further separation box (12) is over the paper web (4).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Staubabtrennung von einer laufenden Papierbahn, insbesondere Tissuebahn, wobei die mit der Papierbahn mitgeführte und staubbeladene Luft aus der Grenzschicht abgetrennt wird. Sie ist vornehmlich dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Papierbahn 4 tangential auf einen als Stabilisator mit gekrümmter Führungsfläche 18 ausgebildeten Abtrennkasten 9 auf- und abläuft und die Luft aus der Grenzschicht abgelenkt und durch den Abtrennkasten 9 geführt wird. Weiters betrifft die Erfindung eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens mit einem quer zur Papierbahn 4 verlaufenden ersten Abtrennkasten 9. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 3/00; B08B 1/02; B08B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 1/02 (2006.01); B08B 5/04 (2006.01); D21F 7/00 (2006.01); D21G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/00 (2013.01); B08B 1/02 (2013.01); B08B 5/04 (2013.01); D21G 3/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101863 A2 20010523; EP 1101863 A3 20030702; AT 408462 B 20011227; AT A195099 A 20010415; BR 0005439 A 20010731; CA 2325507 A1 20010518; US 6457204 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090603

2010-02-24 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2009-12-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090603

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI