Global Patent Index - EP 1101864 A2

EP 1101864 A2 2001-05-23 - Process for transfering a fibrous web

Title (en)

Process for transfering a fibrous web

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Überführen einer zu behandelnden Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé pour transferer une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 1101864 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121725 A

Priority

  • DE 19955030 A
  • DE 10015357 A

Abstract (en)

To transfer a paper or cardboard web (12) between continuous belts (22,24,28,40), where the pick-up belt (28,40) passes around a suction guide roller (36,42) at the transfer zone, both belts (22,24,28,40) are moved by a drive into the transfer position so that the pick-up belt (28,40) penetrates into the delivery belt (22,24) with its suction guide roller (36,42). When the web (12) has been transferred, both belts are returned to their normal working positions. The underpressure in the suction guide roller (36,42) is altered to be at an increased level during web transfer than during normal working. In the normal working position, the belts (22,24,28,40) are spaced apart and the web (12) is in contact with the pick-up belt (28,40) so that the belt (28,40) and the web (12) do not move around the suction guide roller (36,42). With a fixed suction guide roller (36,42), the delivery belt (22,24) is moved by an adjustable guide roller (48,50) into the transfer position. With a moving suction guide roller (36,42), the pick-up belt (28,40) is moved into the transfer position. The web (12) is transferred between the belts either across its whole width, or by a leader strip. The underpressure in the suction guide roller (36,42) is increased during web transfer from (-) 2 m water column to (-) 4 m water column. An Independent claim is included for a web transfer assembly, with at least one transfer point (44,46) where the continuous belts are moved in and out of their transfer positions. Preferred Features: A web transfer point is at least between the web former (30) and a press (14), and between a press (16) and a drying station (41), and between two presses (14,16). The web is carried through at least one press (14,16) between two blankets. At least one press (14,16) is a shoe press, and pref. both presses. At least one transfer point (44,46) is at a zone where a blanket is detached from the web. The belts (22,24,28,40) are each a fourdrinier, a blanket or a drying mesh belt. At least one suction box is within the loop of the delivery belt (22,24), and at least one suction box moves with the delivery belt at the transfer zone, with a variable underpressure. At least one suction box is static, with a constant underpressure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Überführen einer zu behandelnden Faserstoffbahn 12, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, von einem die Faserstoffbahn 12 abgebenden endlosen Bespannungsband 22; 24 an ein die Faserstoffbahn 12 aufnehmendes endloses Bespannungsband 28; 40, das im Überführbereich um eine Saugleitwalze 36; 42 geführt ist, und bei einer entsprechenden Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Faserstoffbahn 12, werden die beiden Bespannungsbänder 22; 28; 24; 40 relativ zueinander über eine Betriebsstellung hinaus, in der das um die Saugleitwalze 36; 42 geführte bahnaufnehmende Bespannungsband 28; 40 die vom bahnabgebenden Bespannungsband 22; 24 zugeführte Faserstoffbahn 12 zumindest im wesentlichen berührt, ohne daß diese und das bahnabgebende Bespannungsband die Saugleitwalze 36; 42 umschlingen, in eine Überführstellung bewegt, in der das um die Saugleitwalze 36; 42 geführte bahnaufnehmende Bespannungsband 28; 40 im Bereich der Saugleitwalze 36; 42 in das bahnabgebende Bespannungsband 22; 24 eintaucht. Nach der Überführung der Faserstoffbahn 12 werden die beiden Bespannungsbänder relativ zueinander zumindest im wesentlichen wieder in die Betriebsstellung bewegt. Gleichzeitig wird der Unterdruck in der Saugleitwalze 36; 42 so verändert, daß er in der Überführstellung größer ist als in der Betriebsstellung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/04 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21G 9/0063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101864 A2 20010523; EP 1101864 A3 20021113; EP 1101864 B1 20050302

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101006

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009627 P 20050407

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI