Global Patent Index - EP 1101865 A2

EP 1101865 A2 2001-05-23 - Process for making a web

Title (en)

Process for making a web

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une feuille

Publication

EP 1101865 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118484 A

Priority

DE 19955032 A

Abstract (en)

To produce a web of paper or cardboard, from a fiber suspension pulp (12), a hydrophobic agent (14) is introduced into the suspension (12) at least in zones, so that the absorbency of moisture is reduced in the dried web at least in the zones where it has been given a hydrophobic character. The hydrophobic agent (14) is especially a synthetic glue, or a modified starch. It is applied across the direction of web travel, in a controlled and variable vol. according to a given additive profile. The vol. of the additive per time unit is constant over part zones of the web, and especially at its edges,. It can also be applied in controlled vols. at zones across the web width, at a constant or variable level per time unit, where it decreases towards the center of the web with larger vols. applied at the edge zones. Or the additive is applied exclusively at the edge zones of the web. The edge zones of the web are given a hydrophobic character in a web width of 0.1-2.0 m and preferably 0.3-1.5 m. The additive profile matches the lateral shrinking profile of the web, which is measured in a dry web to set the additive profile. The hydrophobic agent (14) is added at the stock inlet (16) of the web production machine, which works on a diluting water principle for the agent to be added to the diluting water (18).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Materialbahn, insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, aus einer Stoffsuspension, bei dem der Stoffsuspension bereichsweise ein Hydrophobisierungsmittel zugegeben wird, durch das die Feuchtigkeitsaufnahmefähigkeit der getrockneten Materialbahn in den hydrophobisierten Bereichen reduziert wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/16 (2006.01); D21H 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/16 (2013.01); D21H 23/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19955032 A1 20010517; EP 1101865 A2 20010523; EP 1101865 A3 20020821

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060301

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI