Global Patent Index - EP 1101866 A1

EP 1101866 A1 2001-05-23 - Creped and embossed absorbant paper sheet, embossing roll and embossing process

Title (en)

Creped and embossed absorbant paper sheet, embossing roll and embossing process

Title (de)

Gekrepptes, geprägtes saugfähiges Seidenpapier, Prägewalze und Verfahren zum Prägen

Title (fr)

Feuille de papier absorbant crêpé et gaufré, cylindre de gaufrage et procédé de gaufrage

Publication

EP 1101866 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403240 A

Priority

  • EP 00403240 A
  • EP 99402896 A

Abstract (en)

An embossed sheet has creped cellulose sheet(s) bearing an embossed motif formed by a series of frusta with relatively lower walls between them. Each sheet has a specific weight of 12 - 30 g/m<2>. Independent claims is/are included for the following: (a) A multi-layer absorbent sheet with outer layer(s) as above. (b) A gravure cylinder for embossing a sheet as above has burrs to form the frusta and protuberances to form the walls. (c) Embossing a sheet as in (b). Preferred Features: The walls are 10 - 50 % of the height of the frusta. The frusta for closed loops and the walls form closed figures.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une feuille de papier du type comportant au moins un motif décoratif (14, 16) qui se détache visuellement du fond (12) de la feuille et qui est constitué d'une première série de protubérances (22), de forme générale tronconique, qui sont formées en saillie sur une face (13) de la feuille et qui sont alignées selon un dessin. Selon l'invention, la feuille (10) comporte une seconde série de protubérances, associée à la première série (22), dont chacune est en forme générale de muret (24), qui sont formées en saillie sur ladite une face (13) de la feuille, dont la hauteur est inférieure à la hauteur des protubérances (22) de la première série et dont chacune (24) relie entre elles deux protubérances adjacentes (22) de la première série pour accentuer la perception visuelle de l'entité décorative (14, 16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 27/02; B31F 1/07; D21H 27/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01); D21H 27/02 (2006.01); D21H 27/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); D21H 27/02 (2013.01); D21H 27/40 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0723 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0728 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0733 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0738 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0756 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0758 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0761 (2013.01); Y10T 428/216 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24463 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24628 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24942 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101866 A1 20010523; EP 1101866 B1 20080507; EP 1101866 B2 20120222; AT 394547 T 20080515; CY 1108243 T1 20140212; DE 60038773 D1 20080619; DK 1101866 T3 20080908; DK 1101866 T4 20120529; EP 1101867 A1 20010523; ES 2304936 T3 20081101; ES 2304936 T5 20120605; PT 1101866 E 20080731; US 2003021954 A1 20030130; US 6461720 B1 20021008; US 6680102 B2 20040120

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20120401132

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160523

2016-07-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151121

2016-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-06-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-05-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160523

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20120401132

- Effective date: 20120614

2012-06-12 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2012-06-06 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-06-05 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2304936 T5

- Effective date: 20120605

2012-05-29 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2012-04-12 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60038773

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-02-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-09-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081121

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

2009-03-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20090209

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2304936 T3

2008-09-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080401957

2008-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080722

2008-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60038773 P 20080619

2008-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061130

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI