Global Patent Index - EP 1101871 A1

EP 1101871 A1 2001-05-23 - Steel bridge deck and method for the construction of a bridge with such a deck

Title (en)

Steel bridge deck and method for the construction of a bridge with such a deck

Title (de)

Brückenoberbau aus Stahl und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer diesen Oberbau enthaltenden Brücke

Title (fr)

Tablier de pont métallique et procédé de construction d'un pont comportant un tel tablier

Publication

EP 1101871 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403239 A

Priority

FR 9914606 A

Abstract (en)

The decking for a metal bridge has the longitudinal beams formed from prefabricated sections which are hollow metal tubes (10) of polygonal cross section. The tube lengths are selected for ease of transport. Adjacent sections of two adjacent beams are connected by cross members (2) also formed of metal tubes. The beams are connected at their upper faces by rigid plates (3). The beams can have a rectangular or trapezoidal sections. An Independent claim is also included for a method of assembly of the bridge.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un tablier pour un pont métallique comprenant au moins deux poutres longitudinales (1, 1') reliées par une pluralité d'entretoises transversales (2) et sur lesquelles repose un platelage (4). Conformément à l'invention, chaque poutre longitudinale (1) est constituée par assemblage bout à bout d'une série d'éléments métalliques préfabriqués en forme de caissons creux tubulaires (10) à section transversale polygonale qui s'étendent chacun sur une longueur (L) compatible avec les moyens de transport et de levage, au moins certains caissons (10, 10') de deux poutres voisines (1, 1') étant reliés deux à deux par une pluralité d'entretoises constituées chacune d'un tube métallique (2). L'invention permet, en particulier, la réalisation rapide de ponts provisoires ou la reconstruction de ponts détruits en partie. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 2/04; E01D 15/133; E01D 19/12; E01D 101/26; E01D 101/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 2/04 (2006.01); E01D 15/12 (2006.01); E01D 15/133 (2006.01); E01D 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 2/04 (2013.01); E01D 15/133 (2013.01); E01D 19/125 (2013.01); E01D 2101/268 (2013.01); E01D 2101/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101871 A1 20010523; EP 1101871 B1 20040324; AT 262621 T 20040415; CZ 20004288 A3 20010711; CZ 301753 B6 20100616; DE 60009234 D1 20040429; DZ 3097 A1 20040620; ES 2213554 T3 20040901; FR 2801328 A1 20010525; FR 2801328 B1 20020201; MA 25516 A1 20021001; PL 343955 A1 20010521; PT 1101871 E 20040831; SK 17522000 A3 20011203; TN SN00221 A1 20020530; US 6574818 B1 20030610

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071120

2009-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080605

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071121

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2009-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071121

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071120

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071120

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071121

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080520

2008-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20080703

2008-08-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071120

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071120

2008-07-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-06-03 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080520

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. CIVILE DE *BREVETS MATIERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-14 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-08 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-02 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20061102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20061026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. CIVILE DE *BREVETS MATIERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041120

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213554 T3

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401396

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009234 P 20040429

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL MK RO SI

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2002-02-27 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20011123;MK PAYMENT 20011123;RO PAYMENT 20011123;SI PAYMENT 20011123

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI