Global Patent Index - EP 1101873 A2

EP 1101873 A2 2001-05-23 - Filter tube for placing in a borehole and method for manufacturing the filter tube

Title (en)

Filter tube for placing in a borehole and method for manufacturing the filter tube

Title (de)

Filterrohr zum Einbringen in ein Bodenbohrloch sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung des Filterrohrs

Title (fr)

Tube filtrant à placer dans un puits et méthode de production de ce tube filtrant

Publication

EP 1101873 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124128 A

Priority

DE 19955973 A

Abstract (en)

A filter pipe for inserting into a borehole comprises a support pipe (10) with liquid openings (12) and a porous filter layer (11) arranged on the outer side. The filter layer is made of a sintered plastic material whose pore diameter is smaller on the outer side of the filter layer than on the inner side bordering the support pipe. An Independent claim is also included for the production of the filter pipe comprising melting a lose charge of a sinterable granulate-like or powder-like plastic material to form a filter layer sintered to the support tube in a heating device and cooling after reaching a porous melt or sinter composite. Short term temperature elevation occurs at the end of the heat treatment to heat the outer surface layer of the plastic material.

Abstract (de)

Filterrohr zum Einbringen in ein Bodenbohrloch zum Filtern einer im Boden gespeicherten Flüssigkeit, umfassend ein Trägerrohr mit Flüssigkeitsdurchtrittsöffnungen und einer außenseitig angeordneten porösen Filterschicht aus einem aufgesinterten Kunststoffmaterial. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03B 3/18; E21B 43/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03B 3/20 (2006.01); E21B 43/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/082 (2013.01); E03B 3/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101873 A2 20010523; EP 1101873 A3 20030423; DE 19955973 C1 20020228; DZ 3098 A1 20041129; GC 0000350 A 20070331; MA 25939 A1 20031231; TN SN00217 A1 20020530

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFLEIDERER WATER SYSTEMS GMBH

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI