Global Patent Index - EP 1101874 A1

EP 1101874 A1 2001-05-23 - Tap for the delivery of water

Title (en)

Tap for the delivery of water

Title (de)

Wasserhahn für die Abgabe von Wasser

Title (fr)

Robinet de distribution d'eau

Publication

EP 1101874 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830716 A

Priority

EP 99830716 A

Abstract (en)

A tap (1) comprises a first delivery conduit (5) able to deliver cold water and pure water. The tap (1) comprises a second delivery conduit (8) distinct and separate from the first delivery conduit (5), adapted to deliver hot water. The sharing by the cold water and by the pure water of the same delivery conduit (5) enhances the guarantees that the prescribed chemical-physical characteristics of the pure water shall be retained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2013.01); E03C 2201/30 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101874 A1 20010523; EP 1101874 B1 20060201

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111118

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB

2006-02-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI