Global Patent Index - EP 1101880 A2

EP 1101880 A2 2001-05-23 - Drainage device

Title (en)

Drainage device

Title (de)

Ablaufvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'écoulement

Publication

EP 1101880 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125571 A

Priority

DE 19956024 A

Abstract (en)

The horizontal pipe section (2) on top of the roof being drained extends inwards from the building wall so that the entrance (12) to it is located at a distance from the wall. Water can flow into the entrance from any direction. The entrance to the horizontal pipe section is covered to prevent air from entering once the water has risen to a certain height above the flat surface. The horizontal pipe section is connected to an external down pipe section (4) which fills up once the water on the flat surface has risen to a certain height, and which is specially dimensioned to generate an underpressure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Ablaufvorrichtung zur Abführung von Wasser von einer im Wesentlichen ebenen Fläche, insbesondere von einem Flachdach, durch ein die Fläche begrenzendes Wandstück hindurch, mit einer durch ein sich durch das Wandstück erstreckendes Rohrstück (2, 2') gebildete Ablauföffnung (12), einer Abdeckung (13) zum Abschließen der Ablauföffnung (12) gegen Lufteintritt bei Erreichen eines Grenzwerts des Wasserstands auf der Fläche und mit einer sich an der Außenseite des Wandstücks an das Rohrstück (2, 2') anschließenden Fallleitung (4), die zur Vollfüllung beim Erreichen des Grenzwerts des Wasserstandes und zur Ausbildung eines saugenden Unterdrucks dimensioniert ist, wird eine Verbesserung der Ablaufleistung und eine Verringerung der dabei entstehenden Geräusche dadurch erzielt, dass das Rohrstück (2, 2') auf der Fläche außerhalb des Wandstücks fortgesetzt ist und dass die Ablauföffnung (12) mit einem Abstand von dem Wandstück angeordnet ist, der außerhalb des Rohrstücks (2, 2') eine allseitige Anströmung der Ablauföffnung (12) ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/04; E04D 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/04 (2006.01); E04D 13/064 (2006.01); E04D 13/076 (2006.01); E04D 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/08 (2013.01); E04D 13/0431 (2013.01); E04D 13/0645 (2013.01); E04D 13/0767 (2013.01); E04D 2013/0427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101880 A2 20010523; EP 1101880 A3 20010704; EP 1101880 B1 20020731; AT 221605 T 20020815; DE 19956024 A1 20010621; DE 19956024 C2 20020613; DK 1101880 T3 20020902

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20171130

2018-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLEESTRASSE 87, 4054 BASEL (CH)

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000332

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2005-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2005-09-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 19.08.2005 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-06-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VAHLBRAUK WOLFGANG

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1101880E

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-11-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000332 20020905

2002-09-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-02 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221605 T 20020815

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI