Global Patent Index - EP 1101881 A2

EP 1101881 A2 2001-05-23 - Butt-joint element for façade panels

Title (en)

Butt-joint element for façade panels

Title (de)

Stossfugenelement für Fassadenplatten

Title (fr)

Elément de joint bout à bout pour panneaux de façades

Publication

EP 1101881 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250379 A

Priority

DE 29920358 U

Abstract (en)

The element consists of a thin-walled tunnel-shaped profile element (17) with flanges (19) formed on both sides. The flanges have openings (18) located at the same vertical spacing as hooks (14) which are provided on an attachment profile (12). The tunnel-shaped profile element is U-shaped and the openings are formed in the outer edges of the flanges.

Abstract (de)

Stoßfugenelement für an mit Haken versehenen Befestigungsprofilen aufgehängte Fassadenplatten, gekennzeichnet durch ein dünnwandiges, im wesentlichen tunnelförmiges Profilelement (17) mit beidseitig ausgebildeten Flanschen (19), wobei in den Flanschen (19) im vertikalen Abstand der Haken (14) der Befestigungsprofile (12) zum Hindurchführen der Haken (14) geeignete Aussparungen (18) ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0808 (2013.01); E04F 13/081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920358 U1 20000203; BG 104946 A 20011031; BG 63825 B1 20030228; DE 10056797 A1 20010913; DE 10056797 B4 20050317; EP 1101881 A2 20010523; EP 1101881 A3 20030205

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI