Global Patent Index - EP 1101890 A2

EP 1101890 A2 2001-05-23 - Motor vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Motor vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1101890 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124711 A

Priority

DE 19955882 A

Abstract (en)

The lock has at least one bolt (1,2), a release lever for the bolt, a locking lever (5) and an operation lever (4). The operation lever is elastically coupled to the release lever, at least when the locking lever is in the locked position. The coupling is achieved by an operation spring (12) rotatably fixed to the operation lever. Preferably, the spring is a leg spring, with one leg cooperating with an operation component at the release lever.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um einen Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss, mit wenigstens einem Gesperre (1, 2), einem Auslösehebel (3) für das Gesperre (1, 2), einem Verriegelungshebel (5) und einem Betätigungshebel (4). Erfindungsgemäß ist der Betätigungshebel (4) mit dem Auslösehebel (3) zumindest bei in Verriegelungsstellung befindlichem Verriegelungshebel (5) elastisch nachgebend gekoppelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/00 (2014.01); E05B 77/32 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/01 (2013.01); E05B 77/32 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10S 292/24 (2013.01); Y10S 292/61 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3902873 A1 19900215 - KIEKERT GMBH CO KG [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101890 A2 20010523; EP 1101890 A3 20030102; EP 1101890 B1 20060621; DE 19955882 A1 20010531; DE 19955882 C2 20031023; DE 50013036 D1 20060803; US 6428058 B1 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071111

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013036 P 20060803

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2004-06-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-10-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI