Global Patent Index - EP 1101896 A2

EP 1101896 A2 2001-05-23 - Louvre window

Title (en)

Louvre window

Title (de)

Lamellenfenster

Title (fr)

Fenêtre à lamelles

Publication

EP 1101896 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124915 A

Priority

  • DE 29920788 U
  • DE 20005330 U

Abstract (en)

The panelled window for a building has an outer frame (1) with an electric motor (8) having a threaded drive rod and sleeve (10,11) connected to a drive rod (12). The drive rod is connected to the pivoting window panes to actuate them. The motor can be mounted in the side section of the outer frame.

Abstract (de)

Ein Lamellenfenster weist einen Außenrahmen (1) auf, in welchem die einzelnen Lamellen (6) drehbar gelagert sind. Der Außenrahmen (1) setzt sich aus gleichartigen Profilteilen zusammen, wobei das Profilteii eine erste Kammer (10) zur Außenseite gewandt und eine daran anschließende, mit der ersten Kammer (10) fluchtende und mit dieser verbundene zweite Kammer (9) zur Innenseite gewandt aufweist. In der ersten Kammer (10) ist das Wellenlager der Lamelle (6) untergebracht. Die zweite Kammer (9) ist durch eine abnehmbare winkelförmige Abdeckung (11) verschließbar und dient zur Aufnahme oeispielsweise der die Lamellen (6) gemeinsam betätigenden Schubstange (21). Durch die besondere Ausbildung des Profilteils ist eine gute Zuganglichkeit zu den Einrichtungen gewährleistet, welche im Außenrahmen untergebracht sind, damit werden Wartung und Reparatur ues Lamellenfensters erleichtert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/086

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/32 (2006.01); E06B 7/086 (2006.01); E06B 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/086 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4030627 A1 19920402 - GOETZ MARIA THERESIA [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101896 A2 20010523; EP 1101896 A3 20030528; EP 1101896 B1 20060426; AT 324510 T 20060515; CZ 20004255 A3 20010711; CZ 297898 B6 20070425; DE 50012640 D1 20060601

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111115

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 324510 T

- Effective date: 20111115

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012640

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GLASBAU HAHN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: GLASBAU HAHN GMBH & CO. KG#HANAUER LANDSTRASSE 211#D-60314 FRANKFURT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GLASBAU HAHN GMBH & CO. KG#HANAUER LANDSTRASSE 211#D-60314 FRANKFURT (DE)

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012640 P 20060601

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2004-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR LI

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI